Financial history PALACE FOR LIFE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.50m £2.22m £2.59m £2.68m £3.00m
Total expenditure £2.53m £2.02m £2.42m £2.54m £2.83m
Income from government contracts £148.54k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k £351.59k £405.48k £265.46k £289.80k
Income - Donations and legacies £502.70k £573.43k £341.50k £341.91k £405.59k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.00m £1.65m £2.25m £2.34m £2.57m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £708 £46 £150 £2.34k £23.47k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £40.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.36m £1.94m £2.27m £2.37m £2.60m
Expenditure - Raising funds £167.42k £76.47k £150.02k £158.55k £231.22k
Expenditure - Governance £11.00k £9.61k £9.40k £9.20k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £12.31k £0