Financial history NORTH EAST WALES MIND

Charity number: 1126091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £357.92k £567.05k £509.45k £520.30k £521.52k
Total expenditure £370.40k £413.67k £498.20k £582.27k £568.28k
Income from government contracts £111.19k £111.19k £417.00k £416.59k £389.69k
Income from government grants N/A £58.50k £9.60k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £20.03k £18.34k £48.99k £31.31k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £19.07k £34.15k £52.72k £90.15k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £527.91k £456.93k £416.59k £389.69k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £43 £31 £2.00k £5.35k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £5.02k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £413.67k £498.20k £582.27k £568.28k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £5.28k £5.25k £0 £20.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0