Accounts and annual returns GOOD NEIGHBOUR PROJECT

Charity number: 1126344
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time