HOPE 4 (RUGBY) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Practical help for homeless and badly housed people. All activities operated at Hope Centre, 8 Newbold Road Rugby. The Centre open daily - providing advice and support on numerous issues, hot meals, showers, laundry and networking. Providing sleeping bags, changes of clothes etc. Winter Shelter in local churches (Dec to Mar). Overseeing a Trussell Trust Rugby Foodbank operation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,733 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 29 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANA LISE PETROVNA MANSELL | Chair | 08 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
DAVID PROCTOR | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Phil Clucas | Trustee | 21 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Joyce Woodings | Trustee | 18 February 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.23k | £341.43k | £242.99k | £349.23k | £395.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.46k | £193.33k | £233.35k | £238.87k | £302.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £8.22k | N/A | N/A | £13.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/09/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/10/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, PRIMARILY AMONG HOMELESS PEOPLE IN RUGBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
RUGBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOPE CENTRE
8
NEWBOLD ROAD
RUGBY
WARWICKSHIRE
- Phone:
- 01788572546
- Email:
- administration@hope4.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window