THE ACCESS TO JUSTICE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Access to Justice Foundation receives and distributes additional financial resources to support the provision of free of charge (pro bono) legal assistance to those in need. The Foundation is the recipient of Pro Bono Costs under Section 194 Legal Services Act 2007. Working with the Legal Support Trusts and national organisations, it makes grants to support pro bono projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£10,739,408
Donations and legacies | £10.72m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £22.12k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,326,177
Raising funds | £140.62k | |
Charitable activities | £7.10m | |
Other | £88.42k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £6,698,811 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £229.04k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.10m | |
Retained for future use | £3.41m |
People

12 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Golam Morshed | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ruth Adkin | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Molyneux | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
James Willan | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Lindsey Alice Poole | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
Desmond Pullen | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Sacha Rose | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Maxcine Akinsowon | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Davis | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Gavin Mansfield | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Audrey Haaxman | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Joe Snape | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Seager | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
Sarah Stephens | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Samaras | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.44m | £11.60m | £7.72m | £7.07m | £10.74m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.36m | £11.11m | £7.34m | £7.42m | £7.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.44m | £4.61m | £4.97m | £5.70m | £6.70m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.44m | £11.60m | £7.72m | £7.06m | £10.72m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £497 | £1.02k | £117 | £5.47k | £22.12k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.14m | £10.91m | £7.11m | £7.17m | £7.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £155.89k | £109.88k | £132.91k | £173.57k | £140.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £15.00k | £14.52k | £17.50k | £18.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £10.47m | £6.45m | £6.67m | £6.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £67.72k | £92.11k | £91.09k | £76.89k | £88.42k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £590.16k | £1.48m | £1.53m | £1.28m | £4.56m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £95.46k | £496.23k | £169.51k | £268.25k | £139.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 MAY 2018 as amended on 04 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT (INCLUDING SUCH FINANCIAL SUPPORT AS IS ENVISAGED BY SECTION 194 OF THE LEGAL SERVICES ACT 2007 AS AMENDED OR RE-ENACTED FROM TIME TO TIME) TO PERSONS WHO PROVIDE, OR ORGANISE OR FACILITATE THE PROVISION OF, LEGAL ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE (BY WAY OF REPRESENTATION OR OTHERWISE) WHICH IS FREE OF CHARGE (THAT IS, OTHERWISE THAN FOR OR IN EXPECTATION OF FEE, GAIN OR REWARD) AND WHICH IS PROVIDED DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY TO PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 3.2 THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AIMED AT IMPROVING ACCESS TO JUSTICE BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ACCESS TO JUSTICE FOUNDATION
7 Bell Yard
LONDON
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- 02045228400
- Email:
- enquiries@atjf.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window