UPLIFTING NEPAL'S CHILDREN WITH LOVE AND EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE SUPPORT OF TWO ORPHANAGES IN KATHMANDU, PROVISION OF FUNDS FOR THE ACCOMMODATION, UPKEEP, EDUCATION AND MEDICAL COSTS OF THE ORPHANS AND THEIR CARERS. FINANCIAL AND PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE WITH THE MAINTENANCE OF A CHURCH BUILDING IN HETAUDA AND A CONTRIBUTION TO THE COSTS OF SUPPORTING THE PASTORIAL STAFF
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nepal
Governance
- 30 October 2008: Standard registration
- UNCLE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev IAN WILLIAM SMART | Chair |
|
||||||
Alison Margaret Mcgarel | Trustee | 20 January 2018 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN HAWKSWORTH | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|||||
Michael Hawksworth | Trustee | 06 October 2011 |
|
|||||
PAUL REGINALD HARRIS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.40k | £16.85k | £24.18k | £24.91k | £28.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.06k | £21.04k | £20.46k | £23.78k | £29.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 July 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 9TH OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THOSE LIVING IN POVERTY IN NEPAL, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ORPHANS LIVING IN THE GLORIOUS MINISTRY, HIMALAYAN HOLY CHURCH AND OTHER ORPHANAGES IN NEPAL. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND HEALTH OF CHILDREN LIVING IN ORPHANAGES IN NEPAL, AND IN PARTICULAR THE CHILDREN LIVING IN THE GLORIOUS MINISTRY AND HIMALAYAN HOLY CHURCH ORPHANAGES IN KATHMANDU, BY PROVIDING FUNDING FOR THEIR EDUCATION AND FURTHER EDUCATION, A HEALTHY AND SUSTAINING DIET AND THEIR MEDICAL FEES. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN NEPAL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PLACES OF WORSHIP, ACCOMMODATION AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR THOSE IN CHRISTIAN CHURCH MINISTRY, SUPPORT FOR THE PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND OTHER MEANS TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
20A MILL ROAD
ROYSTON
SG8 7AE
- Phone:
- 01763230021
- Email:
- paulreginaldharris@gmail.com
- Website:
-
ww.uncleuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window