UNSEEN (UK)

Charity number: 1127620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Disrupting and challenging human slavery. Raising awareness of slavery, trafficking and sexual exploitation. Offering training and consultancy to police and other government sevices. Providing safe accommodation and on-going support for survivors of human trafficking so they can rebuild their lives. Collaborating with government, businesses, and NGOs to share information and take effective action.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 January 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosemary Jeanne Hurst Chair 07 May 2022
None on record
Shaun Sawyer Trustee 11 May 2024
CORNWALL COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Leah Nichelle-Marie Brown Trustee 03 February 2024
BIG GREEN HEART
Received: On time
Richard Stuart Marsh Trustee 19 July 2023
None on record
Daniel John Pounder Trustee 13 May 2023
ATTITUDE IS EVERYTHING
Received: On time
THE BRITISH INSTITUTE OF RADIOLOGY
Received: On time
Nicholas John Dutnall Trustee 27 July 2022
None on record
Eric Anderson Trustee 05 February 2022
None on record
Andrea McMahon Trustee 05 February 2022
None on record
Raquel McGrath Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
Samantha Jo Burt Trustee 24 April 2018
None on record
JANICE BIRTLE Trustee 28 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.24m £2.32m £2.46m £3.07m £3.28m
Total expenditure £2.42m £2.25m £2.25m £3.07m £3.41m
Income from government contracts £695.77k £990.87k £1.10m £1.20m £0
Income from government grants £189.88k £187.78k £69.45k £188.88k £39.93k
Income - Donations and legacies £871.11k £802.36k £704.32k £639.68k £469.15k
Income - Other trading activities £15 £27 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.35m £1.53m £1.75m £2.43m £2.81m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £18.28k £6.08k £5.92k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.19m £2.00m £2.02m £2.77m £3.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £227.02k £252.13k £229.48k £295.50k £303.32k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £26.20k £2.87k £30.94k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £41.99k £31.88k £29.51k £45.87k £26.86k
Long-term investments £0 £1 £0 £0 £262.83k
Other assets £781.73k £1.13m £1.20m £1.22m £979.59k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £154.44k £422.43k £279.56k £309.47k £445.18k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Hide Market
West Street
St. Philips
BRISTOL
BS2 0BH
Phone:
03030402888