THE JOHN TOWNSEND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to educate and care for d/Deaf children and young people or young people with communication difficulties, who may have additional needs, for a positive future within work and their communities, preparing them for a positive future. We provide education, care, therapy, medical support, independence training and residential care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2014
Total income:
£13,712,111
Donations and legacies | £799.64k | |
Charitable activities | £12.34m | |
Other trading activities | £566.32k | |
Investments | £1.79k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£13,315,390
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £12.42m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £890.83k | |
Charitable expenditure | £12.42m | |
Retained for future use | £396.72k |
People

402 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
115 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 April 1963: Standard registration
- MONKSHILL FARM (Working name)
- ROYAL SCHOOL FOR DEAF CHILDREN MARGATE (Working name)
- WESTGATE COLLEGE (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL ANDREW SIMPSON | Chair | 25 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
HIS HON JOHN COLYER QC | Trustee | 25 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
LINDSEY ROUSSEAU | Trustee | 25 July 2011 |
|
|||||
WENDY JANE EADSFORTH | Trustee | 25 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.67m | £12.78m | £12.12m | £14.51m | £13.71m | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.94m | £12.58m | £10.52m | £12.74m | £13.32m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £485.86k | £334.66k | £322.31k | £2.43m | £799.64k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £312.12k | £350.17k | £482.63k | £570.67k | £566.32k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £11.65m | £11.31m | £11.15m | £11.50m | £12.34m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £83.67k | £64.91k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £12.00k | £9.14k | £0 | £2.71k | £1.79k | |
|
Income - Other | £298.00k | £838.85k | £163.86k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £87.61k | £269.75k | £193.61k | £2.43m | £8.72k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.60m | £12.20m | £10.03m | £12.03m | £12.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.30k | £15.25k | £17.76k | £18.55k | £15.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £85.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.61m | £13.26m | £13.40m | £14.84m | £15.99m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.08m | £1.42m | £2.09m | £1.92m | £1.71m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.83m | -£2.04m | -£2.85m | -£1.05m | -£242.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.25m | £1.33m | £2.06m | £1.75m | £2.77m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
1A TO EDUCATE AND CARE FOR PERSONS WHO ARE DEAF OR WHO HAVE DIFFICULTIES IN COMMUNICATING WITH OTHERS (INCLUDING SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE ALSO DISADVANTAGED IN OTHER WAYS) AND WHO HAVE NEED OF EDUCATION AND CARE BY VIRTUE OF THEIR DISADVANTAGES AND DIFFICULTIES; 1B TO PREPARE SUCH PERSONS FOR LIVING, AND TO ASSIST THEM TO LIVE, WITHIN THE COMMUNITY; 1C TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST SUCH PERSONS WHO REQUIRE PROLONGED CARE BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE THOUGHT FIT WHICH MAY INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THEM; 1D TO MAKE GRANTS TO SUCH PERSONS OR ASSIST OTHER CHARITIES (INCLUDING ROYAL SCHOOL FOR DEAF CHILDREN MARGATE THE TRUSTEE) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM; 1E TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; IN EACH CASE GIVING PREFERENCE: FIRST TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 18; AND SECONDLY TO YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25. 2 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AS TO THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS AND TO TRAIN THOSE WHO ARE INTERESTED TO COMMUNICATE WITH THEM. 3 TO TRAIN INTERESTED MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO EDUCATE AND CARE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Linked charities
- AFTER CARE FUND
- ARTHUR WILLIAMS EDUCATIONAL PROGRESS PRIZE FUND
- CHARLOTTE E HARE MEMORIAL PRIZE
- CHILDRENS FUND
- EDWARD WADSWORTH ENDOWMENT FUND
- ELLIOTT MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- EMMA ETHEL BROWN LEGACY
- LEONARD MORTIMER PRIZE FUND
- MARTHA CRAIG MEMORIAL FUND
- POCOCK MEMORIAL FUND
- R C PETERS MEMORIAL PRIZE
- SIDNEY E LAWRENCE FUND
- SIDNEY MORTIMER PRIZE FUND
- SIDNEY STOPS ENDOWMENT FUND
- SIR JOHN HOWARD ENDOWMENT FUND
- THE JOHN TOWNSEND FOUNDATION
- 02 April 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL SCHOOL FOR DEAF CHILDREN
VICTORIA ROAD
MARGATE
CT9 1NB
- Phone:
- 01843227561
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window