Financial history PARTRIDGE GREEN AREA RESPONSE TEAM

Charity number: 1131374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/06/2020 08/06/2021 08/06/2022 08/06/2023 08/06/2024
Total gross income £2.63k £2.78k £650 £1.55k £778
Total expenditure £2.09k £2.02k £908 £2.05k £5.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A