WATERHARVEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WaterHarvest works through local voluntary organisations with rural communities in Africa, primarily in relation to water but also in the are as of health, education, income generation and empowerment of women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ghana
- Uganda
Governance
- 16 January 2009: Standard registration
- 30 January 2013: Funds received from 802135 WELLS FOR INDIA
- WELLS FOR INDIA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Jane Beukes | Chair | 27 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Justin Peter Boynton | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Jon Davies | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Alice Flora La Trobe Weston | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £417.19k | £410.22k | £373.24k | £388.69k | £337.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £399.43k | £359.95k | £436.07k | £329.85k | £444.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR DISTRESS AMONG PEOPLE OF THE THIRD WORLD. 2 OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES NOT FALLING UNDER THE ABOVE HEADING AND TO WHICH THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE TO APPLY ANY PART OF THE TRUST FUND
Area of benefit
THE THIRD WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BASEPOINT
1 WINNALL VALLEY ROAD
WINCHESTER
HAMPSHIRE
SO23 0LD
- Phone:
- 01962588200
- Email:
- office@water-harvest.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window