LYTH VALLEY FIRST RESPONDER GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of First Responder Services to several villages in the Lyth Valley Area of South Lakeland,Cumbria under the direction of the North West Ambulance Service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 30 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES BLAND | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
JAMES BOWNASS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
John Milburn Holmes | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/04/2020 | 02/04/2021 | 02/04/2022 | 02/04/2023 | 02/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.27k | £400 | £429 | £475 | £629 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.12k | £0 | £75 | £55 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2022 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PERSONS RESIDING IN THE LYTH VALLEY, CUMBRIA COMPRISING THE VILLAGES OF BRIGSTEER,CROOK,CROSTHWAITE,UNDERBARROW WITHERSLACK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY RESPONDING TO ACUTE ADULT MEDICAL COLLAPSE.
Area of benefit
THE LYTH VALLEY, CUMBRIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOWER HILL
CROSTHWAITE
KENDAL
LA8 8HX
- Phone:
- 01539568599
- Email:
- johnmholmes@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window