THE FARMING LIFE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Farming Life Centre is dedicated to improving the quality of life of Peak District farmers and rural communities. It promotes health and well-being through its projects, services and resources and celebrates hill-farming past, present and future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £14,304 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 22 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Searston | Chair | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Critchlow | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lowe | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Hadfield | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ceridwen Anne Morgan | Trustee | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
William George Case | Trustee | 26 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Christopher Gilbert Morris | Trustee | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.51k | £44.17k | £70.28k | £102.95k | £80.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.52k | £37.52k | £49.98k | £83.78k | £86.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.60k | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | £14.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED 9 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG THE FARMING COMMUNITY IN THE AREA DEFINED BY THE CURRENT BOUNDARIES OF THE PEAK DISTRICT NATIONAL PARK.
Area of benefit
THE AREA DEFINED BY THE CURRENT BOUNDARIES OF THE PEAK DISTRICT NATIONAL PARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Agricultural Business Centre
Agricultural Way
Bakewell
Derbyshire
DE45 1AH
- Phone:
- 01629810903
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window