Financial history BRANSGORE COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity Number: 1127931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £161.41k £159.34k £168.44k £88.25k £0
Total expenditure £168.83k £156.54k £162.39k £79.70k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A