Financial history ST. SOPHIA'S SCHOOL BENEVOLENT FUND LIMITED

Charity Number: 1138475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £215.29k £214.05k £203.00k £207.91k £235.22k
Total expenditure £184.76k £191.13k £199.22k £221.28k £247.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A