ST. SOPHIA'S SCHOOL BENEVOLENT FUND LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teachers teach the Greek language, history, culture, singing and dance to pupils of the school during classes held for each age group each Saturday morning from 9.30 am to 1.15 pm. Bursaries are given to 11 deserving pupils based on the financial need of the parents in each case.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 19 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CALLIOPE CAROUSSIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Panayiotou | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Shall | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleni Goulandris | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Christos Nifadopoulos | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|||||
MARIA-ELENI NIKOLOPOULOU | Trustee | 23 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARIA SPYROU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ISIDORE MARGARONIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STACIA POLEMIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARO LIMNIOS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS PALEOCRASSAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
V.RT.REV THEONAS BAKALIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.29k | £214.05k | £203.00k | £207.91k | £235.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.76k | £191.13k | £199.22k | £221.28k | £247.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 OCTOBER 1966 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 30 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN GREEK LANGUAGE, HISTORY, CULTURE AND DANCE BY THE PROVISION OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. SOPHIAS CHURCH VICARAGE
MOSCOW ROAD
LONDON
W2 4LQ
- Phone:
- 07500654610
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window