LMCP CARE LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve wellbeing by enabling people to become more independent and take control and responsibility over their lives. Core objectives: to provide information, advice, support to South Asian communities to enable them to access appropriate health and social care services. Other activities: supporting research; social work placements; volunteering; cultural awareness training and consultancy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £39,234 from 2 government contract(s) and £47,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
- Trafford
Governance
- 25 February 2009: Standard registration
- 11 May 2011: Funds received from 1045585 LONGSIGHT MOSS SIDE COMMUNITY PROJECT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Sara Ryan | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
DR Saniya Zahra Ali | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
J S BAMRAH | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|||||
GEORGE DEVLIN | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.84k | £103.97k | £158.27k | £140.44k | £91.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.03k | £104.79k | £138.80k | £137.24k | £97.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £31.50k | £43.97k | £66.00k | £55.64k | £39.23k | |
|
Income from government grants | £81.44k | £50.76k | £62.27k | £47.27k | £47.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/10/2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LONGSIGHT AND MOSS SIDE AND THEIR ENVIRONS BY ASSOCIATING THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, INSTITUTIONS, BUSINESSES AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE HEALTH, RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LONGSIGHT AND MOSS SIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pastoral Centre
95A Princess Road
MANCHESTER
M14 4TH
- Phone:
- 01612264632
- Email:
- info@lmcp.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window