THE ROYAL AIR FORCE FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organising of football activities within the RAF. This includes organising football leagues, cup competitions, coaching courses, referee courses for all genders. Governance in line with FA and RAF FA Sports Board regulations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 May 2009: Standard registration
- RAFFA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Jon Smith | Chair | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martin Wilkinson | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Reid | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Knight | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Hetherington | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Philippou | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Morley | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Rachel Portlock | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joan Ochuodho | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Louise Hancock | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.83k | £153.63k | £146.40k | £177.00k | £194.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.07k | £144.69k | £130.37k | £209.40k | £205.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION. INCORPORATED 08 JULY 2008 AS AMENDED 06 MARCH 2009. as amended on 13 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF HER MAJESTY'S ARMED FORCES BY INCREASING PHYSICAL FITNESS, FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS AND RAISING MORALE OF MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL AIR FORCE AND OTHER SERVICES, IN PARTICULAR ( BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION), THROUGH THE PLAYING OF, ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION IN AND PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF FOOTBALL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Air Force
Brize Norton
Carterton
OX18 3LX
- Phone:
- 01993895704
- Email:
- info@royalairforcefa.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window