Financial history REETH AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY SPORTS CLUB LTD

Charity number: 1129787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/06/2020 04/06/2021 04/06/2022 04/06/2023 04/06/2024
Total gross income £4.28k £17.75k £3.51k £5.06k £4.13k
Total expenditure £30.02k £30.44k £28.97k £28.43k £30.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.67k N/A N/A N/A