AGE CYMRU

Charity number: 1128436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Age Cymru is a powerful voice campaigning for change. We work alongside national and local government and other partners to develop solutions and provide services. With our local partners, we deliver trusted information, help people access new technologies, offer practical support and social opportunities, and respond to market failures.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 June 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eleanor Sanders Trustee 22 November 2023
BETHANIA EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Received: On time
Dr Catrin Elizabeth Davies Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
Robert Jack Mansfield Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Professor John Robert Williams Trustee 30 January 2020
WEST WALES DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICE LTD
Received: On time
Diane Margaret Hughes Trustee 30 January 2020
None on record
Charles William Manning carter OBE Trustee 30 November 2018
None on record
Maria Jeanne Coggins Trustee 25 January 2018
None on record
Steven Milsom Trustee 25 January 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.25m £2.69m £2.69m £2.34m £2.42m
Total expenditure £1.79m £2.51m £2.78m £2.48m £2.62m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.32m £1.68m £1.92m £1.67m £1.88m
Income - Donations and legacies £336.43k £178.25k £202.72k £221.58k £74.10k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.91m £2.51m £2.48m £2.12m £2.33m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.93k £254 £186 £4.04k £16.03k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £268.45k £148.27k £177.73k £180.56k £26.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.79m £2.51m £2.78m £2.48m £2.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4 £11 £20 £13 £25.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £20.58k £29.30k £15.25k £1.68k £21.01k
Long-term investments £4 £4 £2 £2 £2
Other assets £1.72m £2.12m £3.72m £1.80m £1.49m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£32.93k -£64.25k -£39.28k -£42.23k -£11.64k
Total liabilities £37.69k £244.37k £1.96m £179.27k £142.74k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 OCTOBER 1975 AS AMENDED 12 OCTOBER 1983, 14 JUNE 1984, 4 OCTOBER 1988, 25 NOVEMBER 1993, 7 SEPTEMBER 1995, 12 JUNE, 25 JUNE 1998, 15 AUGUST 2003 & 17 OCTOBER 2007 AS AMENDED 15 OCTOBER 2008, 18 MARCH 2009 AND 26 FEBRUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR OLDER PEOPLE: PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF OLDER PEOPLE; ADVANCING EDUCATION; PREVENTING OR RELIEVING SICKNESS, DISEASE OR SUFFERING IN OLDER PEOPLE (WHETHER EMOTIONAL, MENTAL AND/OR PHYSICAL); PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; PROMOTING THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS; ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OR DISADVANTAGE; AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR OLDER PEOPLE: PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF OLDER PEOPLE; ADVANCING EDUCATION; PREVENTING OR RELIEVING SICKNESS, DISEASE OR SUFFERING IN OLDER PEOPLE (WHETHER EMOTIONAL, MENTAL AND/OR PHYSICAL); PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; PROMOTING THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS; ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OR DISADVANTAGE; AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR OLDER PEOPLE: PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF OLDER PEOPLE; ADVANCING EDUCATION; PREVENTING OR RELIEVING SICKNESS, DISEASE OR SUFFERING IN OLDER PEOPLE (WHETHER EMOTIONAL, MENTAL AND/OR PHYSICAL); PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; PROMOTING THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS; ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OR DISADVANTAGE; AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR OLDER PEOPLE: PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF OLDER PEOPLE; ADVANCING EDUCATION; PREVENTING OR RELIEVING SICKNESS, DISEASE OR SUFFERING IN OLDER PEOPLE (WHETHER EMOTIONAL, MENTAL AND/OR PHYSICAL); PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; PROMOTING THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS; ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OR DISADVANTAGE; AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE THE OUTCOME OF THIS BEING THE PROMOTION OF THE WELL-BEING OF OLDER PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
THE PRINCIPALITY OF WALES
Registration history
  • 24 June 2010 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Age Cymru
Ground Floor Trident Court
East Moors Road
CARDIFF
CF24 5TD
Phone:
02920431555