THE VIRTUAL DOCTORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Virtual Doctors run by the charity aims to provide doctor-supported diagnostic assistance to remote communities in Africa, using telemedicine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
180 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brighton And Hove
- Malawi
- Zambia
Governance
- 01 June 2009: Standard registration
- THE VIRTUAL DOCTORS LTD (Previous name)
- VIRTUAL DEVELOPMENT UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naggib Chakhane | Chair | 02 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Daniel William John Grace | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Callcott | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Burke | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Dutton | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.37k | £304.87k | £475.97k | £188.37k | £129.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.51k | £311.08k | £207.02k | £192.38k | £173.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 November 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 November 2022 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 MAR 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH B) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION C) THE RELIEF OF NEED THESE OBJECTS WILL PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BE UNDERTAKEN IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AND COMMUNITIES WHICH LACK EFFECTIVE GOVERNMENT SERVICES OR INFRASTRUCTURE"
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUSSEX INNOVATION CENTRE
UNIVERSITY OF SUSSEX
FALMER
BRIGHTON
BN1 9SB
- Phone:
- 01903 203720
- Email:
- info@virtualdoctors.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window