Financial history THE INSPIRE AND ACHIEVE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/08/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £438.19k £853.03k £1.18m £456.65k £562.97k
Total expenditure £382.55k £912.98k £1.29m £417.78k £476.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £391.17k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.75k £9.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.45k £2.70k N/A £2.54k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £7.44k N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £815.79k £1.17m N/A £560.44k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Other N/A £35.79k £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £906.50k £1.27m N/A £469.48k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £6.49k £14.18k N/A £7.39k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £21.47k £24.37k N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £0