Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WHITNASH
Charity number: 1128890
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Benjamin William Cook | Chair | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Simms | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Stafford | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Thomas | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Oliver Andrew Babbington | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Hill | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Esther Brown | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Davies | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Barton | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Edmonds | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stoodley | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julia Elizabeth Louise Davies | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Audrie Fincken | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Simms | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIMON GREAVES | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.