FRIENDS OF QUEEN MARY'S SIDCUP LIMITED

Charity number: 1129677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising for the benefit of Queen Mary's Hospital Sidcup through the management of a Cafe and Kiosk on the hospital site. These provide a comprehensive service to patients, relatives and staff. The service is provided through approximately 40 volunteers working on a managed rota basis.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £50,370
Total expenditure: £18,110

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bexley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 May 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF QUEEN MARY'S HOSPITAL LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHILIP BENSON WOODMAN Chair
THE ROTARY CLUB OF SIDCUP EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF WEST KENT BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
Erbay Rushden Trustee 07 March 2023
None on record
Paul Edward Davidson Trustee 01 March 2022
THE ROTARY CLUB OF SIDCUP EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
KEMNAL'S OWN SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
DAVID CHARLES DENNIS Trustee 01 January 2016
THE ROTARY CLUB OF SIDCUP EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
SIDCUP ROTARY CLUB BENEVOLENT TRUST
Received: On time
SANDRA GROOMBRIDGE Trustee
None on record
MR CHRIS ELMS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £66.99k £11.86k £164 £30.02k £50.37k
Total expenditure £51.21k £12.89k £7.88k £7.29k £18.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
QUEEN MARYS HOSPITAL
FROGNAL AVENUE
SIDCUP
DA14 6LT
Phone:
02083026589
Website:

No information available