Financial history LEEDS UNIVERSITY UNION

Charity Number: 1136742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £11.22m £8.41m £13.12m £13.96m £14.58m
Total expenditure £11.51m £8.60m £13.06m £13.98m £14.43m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £668.53k £9.91k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.53m £4.09m £3.91m £4.04m £4.31m
Income - Other trading activities £351.29k £160.47k £270.08k £331.92k £405.00k
Income - Charitable activities £6.46m £3.47m £8.81m £9.53m £9.76m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.80k £248 £300 £13.97k £73.00k
Income - Other £871.60k £697.03k £126.82k £40.96k £38.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.51m £8.60m £13.06m £13.98m £14.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £27.26k £25.21k £14.20k £28.42k £38.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0