Financial history AIGBURTH COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1129291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £186.22k £319.13k £190.14k £186.98k £199.41k
Total expenditure £166.49k £158.81k £223.51k £153.87k £199.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A