NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide support and information to Prostate Cancer patients of all ages and their carers, and raise awareness of prostate cancer among the general public in the North Staffordshire area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 15 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE STEVENSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Reginald John Aldridge | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lamb | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward James Broomhall | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Capewell | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eric Bailey | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
NEIL Harry BLURTON | Trustee | 31 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH SMEDLEY | Trustee | 19 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA HACKNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev William Arthur Wakelin | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.66k | £660 | £840 | £1.21k | £1.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.83k | £5.49k | £877 | £1.20k | £1.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
* PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF MEN WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND THEIR CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE * WORK IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER STATUTORY AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS TO IMPROVE THE SERVICES AND TREATMENT RELATING TO PROSTATE CANCER * ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO PROSTATE CANCER
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 GREEN LANE
BLYTHE BRIDGE
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST11 9LZ
- Phone:
- 01782393623
- Email:
- clivestevenson19@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window