THE LONDON REGIMENT WELFARE AND BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The London Regiment continues to promote and build funds which generates monies for its troops Welfare and Benevolence, particularly for those personnel and families, who are currently serving on mobilised operational service. We are actively raising funds by charitable means promoting sponsorship in such activities as Marathons, Golf Competitions, Expeditions and General Fund Raising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brigadier Jeremy Moomey TD | Chair |
|
||||||
Derek Harwood | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS HALLETT | Trustee | 05 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR GREG TRUMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT DENMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.50k | £5.88k | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.33k | £2.50k | £6.80k | £800 | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 April 2023 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2022 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
GOVERNING DOCUMENT 22 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: (1) TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY SERVING OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE LONDON REGIMENT AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY; AND (2) THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE LONDON REGIMENT BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF SERVICE PERSONNEL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LONDON REGIMENT
27 ST JOHN'S HILL
BATTERSEA
LONDON
SW11 1TT
- Phone:
- 02079243122
- Email:
- londons-rao@mod.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window