Friends and Family Fundraising of Market Rasen Church of England Primary School

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises funds for the children of Market Rasen Church of England Primary School, through non uniform days, cinema nights, family bingo, annual summer fete, discos, coffee mornings, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 04 August 2009: Standard registration
- MARKET RASEN CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL FRIENDS OF SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley De Ath | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Lindsay Pickworth | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Scott Oldfield | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Nicola Proctor | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sally Jacklin | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ANDREW SMITH | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|||||||
NICHOLA ALLERSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.01k | £919 | £1.31k | £1.31k | £6.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75k | £2.94k | £2.05k | £2.05k | £3.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 02 February 2021 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 24 JUNE 2009 as amended on 22 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL BY: A) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL B) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES ER PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Market Rasen C of E Primary School
Mill Road
Market Rasen
LN8 3BL
- Phone:
- 01673842395
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window