BLOODHOUND LIFELINE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the suffering of bloodhounds and related types of hounds in need of care and attention and, in particular, to provide and maintain rescue homes or other facilities for the reception , care and treatment of such animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 April 2010: Standard registration
- 09 September 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 September 2022: Funds transferred to 227523 DOGS TRUST LEGACY
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.18k | £10.28k | £10.79k | £8.17k | £1.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.15k | £16.14k | £13.82k | £15.14k | £6.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF BLOODHOUNDS AND RELATED TYPES OF HOUNDS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window