STOKESLEY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement of Beliefs, in such ways and such parts of the United Kingdom or the World as the Trustees think fit, and fulfil such other purposes connected with the charitable work of the church. To relieve sickness and financial hardship and to promote good health of individuals and the wider society by the provision of funds, goods or services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
- Stockton-on-tees
- Cambodia
- Romania
- Turkey
Governance
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.96k | £17.22k | £13.28k | £15.89k | £10.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.40k | £15.08k | £16.98k | £17.51k | £12.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 11 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH 2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH OF INDIVIDUALS AND THE WIDER SOCIETY BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window