THE COLLEGE OF ALL SOULS OF THE FAITHFUL DEPARTED, OF OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All Souls College is part of the University of Oxford. It advances research and education, particularly in the Humanities, the Law, the Social Sciences, the Natural Sciences, and Mathematics; promotes the links between the academic world and public life; and maintains the tradition of the College as a place of prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£15,638,000
Donations and legacies | £1.00k | |
Charitable activities | £622.00k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £14.97m | |
Other | £46.00k |
Total expenditure:
£9,473,000
Raising funds | £2.30m | |
Charitable activities | £7.18m | |
Other | £0 |
£36,763,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £314,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.30m | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.18m | |
Retained for future use | £6.17m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.30m | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.18m | |
Retained for future use | £42.93m |
People

119 Employee(s)
85 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 4 |
£120k to £130k | 11 |
£130k to £140k | 3 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 15 September 2010: Standard registration
- ALL SOULS COLLEGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
85 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR, SIR JOHN VICKERS | Chair |
|
||||||
JUSTAS PETRAUSKAS | Trustee | 03 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DEJOY SHASTIKK KUMARAN | Trustee | 03 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
REVD CANON RACHEL CARNEGIE | Trustee | 02 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ALPA SHAH | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR RODERICK CRAIG MACLEAN | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL JONATHAN BRADDICK | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
SIMON SWAIN | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DAME ANGELA MCLEAN | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
AUGUSTUS SMITH | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Sarah Ann Moore | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Evans | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Catherine Macdonald | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR OLADAPO OLADIPO OLAKUNLE AKANDE | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Matan Mazor | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Tan | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Noam Yuchtman | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR ANTONIA WEBERLING | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Linton | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nuno Castel-Branco | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paula Chan | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROSS ANDERSON | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
LORD ANDREW STEPHEN BURROWS | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr CLAIRE HALL | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
OLANA PETERS | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD HAMEEM BIN SHEIK ALAUDIN | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR THOMAS HEGGHAMMER | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor MICHAEL JOHN LOBBAN | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr DMITRI LEVITIN | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tess Mary Saltmarsh Little | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROSS MONCRIEFF | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE COOPER | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAMIAN ADAM MAHER | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN CHARLES RENTON | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr TAKATO YOSHIMURA | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr RUSTAM JAMILOV | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDROS PAUL HOLLENDER | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JAMES SCAMBLER | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALISON NICOLE JOHN | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
CARL PHILIPP EMANUEL NOTHAFT | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Erik Panzer | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Miriam Meyerhoff | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sheilagh Catheren Ogilvie | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Timothy Andrew Orville Endicott | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Justin Stover | Trustee | 14 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR Amia Srinivasan | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Georgiou | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chun Hin Lucas Tse | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Wolf | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
George Woudhuysen | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Frederick Wilmot-Smith | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dame Marina Warner DBE FBA, | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR SANTANU DAS | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MERRINGTON | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR LUCIA PRAUSCELLO | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR GAVIN SALAM | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR EFSTATHIOS KALYVAS | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALEX MULLEN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
RUTH HARRIS | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JULIA MARY HOWARD SMITH | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR LUCIA HELEN ZEDNER | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR IAN RUMFITT | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DIWAKAR ACHARYA | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR CATRIONA SETH | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR WOLFGANG ERNST | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CATHERINE MORGAN OBE | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PETER WILSON | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR FRANCIS BROWN | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR CECILE FABRE | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PAUL FENDLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR BEATA SMARZYNSKA JAVORCIK | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr CLARE BUCKNELL | Trustee | 15 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR NEIL KENNY FBA | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIR NOEL MALCOLM FBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lord William Arthur Waldegrave of North Hill PC, MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR SUZANNE AIGRAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JOHN NICHOLAS PEREGRINE HORDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RT HON DR JOHN REDWOOD MP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR IAN LOADER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR COLIN BURROW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR LAUNCELOT HENDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR CECILIA TRIFOGLI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ANDREW IAN WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORD DAVID PANNICK QC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR CECILIA HEYES FBA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.85m | £11.62m | £10.41m | £13.48m | £15.64m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.94m | £10.93m | £14.40m | £12.02m | £9.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £535.44k | £417.44k | £302.23k | £336.00k | £314.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £8.17k | £8.00k | £1.95k | £2.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £49.97k | £48.07k | £73.90k | £61.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £536.48k | £141.99k | £183.61k | £600.00k | £622.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £11.62m | £10.60m | £9.57m | £12.78m | £14.97m | |
|
Income - Other | £639.14k | £821.68k | £583.72k | £33.00k | £46.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.69m | £9.70m | £12.88m | £10.61m | £7.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.25m | £1.23m | £1.52m | £1.41m | £2.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £24.39k | £23.94k | £21.43k | £24.00k | £66.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £10.85k | £923.34k | £30.85k | £86.00k | £142.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £1.25m | £1.23m | £1.52m | £1.41m | £2.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.10m | £11.01m | £10.65m | £13.32m | £15.78m | |
|
Long-term investments | £454.40m | £515.81m | £538.66m | £527.26m | £563.08m | |
|
Other assets | £3.51m | £3.96m | £3.83m | £3.36m | £4.19m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£3.07m | -£2.43m | -£4.35m | -£4.18m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.53m | £2.26m | £2.18m | £2.11m | £2.58m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARTER OF FOUNDATION 20 MAY 1438 AND STATUTES MADE 25 JUNE 1925 LAST AMENDED 8 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PRAY FOR THE SOULS OF ALL THE FAITHFUL DEPARTED AND TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF PHILOSOPHY, ARTS, THEOLOGY AND CIVIL AND CANON LAW
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGH STREET
OXFORD
OX1 4AL
- Phone:
- 01865279379
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window