THE WARDEN AND SCHOLARS OF THE HOUSE OR COLLEGE OF SCHOLARS OF MERTON IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING THROUGH PROVISION OF TEACHING AND EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT TO APPROXIMATELY 600 RESIDENT UNDERGRADUATE AND GRADUATE STUDENTS WHO ARE ENGAGED ON A COURSE OF STUDIES LEADING TO THE AWARD OF A DEGREE IN THE UNIVERISTY OF OXFORD AND THROUGH THE APPOINTMENT OR EMPLOYMENT OF FELLOWS AND ACADEMIC STAFF WHO ARE ACTIVELY ENGAGED IN RESEARCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£21,160,000
Donations and legacies | £4.95m | |
Charitable activities | £7.02m | |
Other trading activities | £695.00k | |
Investments | £8.49m | |
Other | £4.00k |
Total expenditure:
£21,855,000
Raising funds | £3.24m | |
Charitable activities | £18.06m | |
Other | £553.00k |
£50,183,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.80m | |
Charitable expenditure | £18.06m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.80m | |
Charitable expenditure | £18.06m | |
Retained for future use | £49.49m |
People

155 Employee(s)
52 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 6 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 4 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 15 November 2010: Standard registration
- MERTON COLLEGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
52 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Justin White | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ted Tregear | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rory Gregson | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Stanislav Zivny | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Samuel Fletcher | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Krishnan Jesse Ram-Prasad | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Philipp Nadlinger | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martina Astrid Rodda | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lucy Brookes | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Naomi Waltham-Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lindsay Baker | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor James Newton | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Coote | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nathaniel Lane | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Gover | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Thomas Richards | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Altehenger | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alice Brooke | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Helen Small | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Madhavi Krishnan | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Julian Knight | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Matthew Higgins | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ehud Hrushovski | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lorna Hutson | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tim Lightfoot | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR HUGH WATKINS | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|||||
FRA' JOHN EIDINOW | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Prof Radek Erban | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MACKIE | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bassel Tarbush | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES ALAN HEATHCOTE ALEXANDER | Trustee | 14 February 2013 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR SIR ANDREW WILES | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kate Blackmon | Trustee | 01 October 2003 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ALAN MORRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor RHIANNON ASH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR SIMON MARTIN HOOKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor MICHAEL WHITWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF DAVID PATERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ALEXANDER SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ARTUR EKERT | Trustee |
|
||||||
Prof. Daniel MacGregor Grimley | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR IRENE LEMOS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Matthew Grimley | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr JULIA CAROLINE WALWORTH | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR PETER WILLIAM HAROLD HOLLAND | Trustee |
|
||||||
Professor JONATHAN RALPH WARBURG PRAG | Trustee |
|
||||||
Professor IAN MACLACHLAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor ALAN BARR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor ALEXANDER SCHEKOCHIHIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor STEVEN GUNN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Warden JENNIFER PAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor PATRICIA THORNTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.69m | £13.85m | £15.11m | £19.30m | £21.16m | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.60m | £16.97m | £18.98m | £19.05m | £21.86m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.22m | £2.65m | £3.05m | £1.93m | £4.95m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £526.00k | £17.00k | £672.00k | £493.00k | £695.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.47m | £4.64m | £5.47m | £6.66m | £7.02m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £479.00k | £1.48m | £1.59m | £316.00k | £1.64m | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.11m | £6.34m | £5.90m | £7.48m | £8.49m | |
|
Income - Other | £366.00k | £198.00k | £24.00k | £8.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £320.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £12.29m | £14.82m | £16.01m | £16.17m | £18.06m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.92m | £2.13m | £2.51m | £2.42m | £3.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £24.00k | £26.00k | £31.00k | £34.00k | £37.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10.00k | £274.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £1.38m | £1.64m | £1.81m | £1.85m | £2.68m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £392.00k | £14.00k | £464.00k | £467.00k | £553.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £17.56m | £16.96m | £16.67m | £16.52m | £16.49m | |
|
Long-term investments | £277.04m | £317.15m | £341.26m | £334.56m | £383.02m | |
|
Other assets | £12.15m | £9.11m | £10.97m | £10.47m | £10.47m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.01m | -£1.83m | -£3.10m | -£1.89m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.87m | £1.79m | £2.30m | £1.60m | £2.43m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
FOUNDED IN 1264 WITH STATUTES DATED 30 APRIL 1926 LAST AMENDED MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUL 2015 08 NOV 2022 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08 NOV 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIGION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH AND TO BE A COLLEGE IN OXFORD OR ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MERTON COLLEGE
MERTON STREET
OXFORD
OX1 4JD
- Phone:
- 01865276310
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window