Financial history THE FOUNDATION OF SIR JOHN PERCYVALE IN MACCLESLFIELD OF 1502, RE-FOUNDED BY KING EDWARD VI IN 1552

Charity Number: 1137204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £13.80m £15.05m £17.07m £17.23m £18.92m
Total expenditure £12.87m £14.55m £15.33m £16.79m £18.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £650.00k £322.00k £1.30m £120.00k £77.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £278.00k £502.00k £530.00k £592.00k
Income - Charitable activities £12.50m £14.23m £15.01m £16.08m £17.72m
Income - Endowments £0 £45.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £63.00k £25.00k £42.00k £236.00k £212.00k
Income - Other £587.00k £190.00k £214.00k £256.00k £318.00k
Income - Legacies £13.00k £45.00k £1.27m £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.87m £13.25m £14.56m £16.01m £17.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £4.00k £4.00k £6.00k £6.00k
Expenditure - Governance £95.00k £60.00k £62.00k £0 £151.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £73.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £1.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.29m £763.00k £779.00k £838.00k