THE FOUNDATION OF SIR JOHN PERCYVALE IN MACCLESLFIELD OF 1502, RE-FOUNDED BY KING EDWARD VI IN 1552

Charity Number: 1137204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of education by the provision of high quality education for boys and girls and a wide range of extra curricular activities in the King's School in Macclesfield. The School provides bursaries for pupils in need of financial assistance. The School also provides various other educational opportunities and facilities to the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 December 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FOUNDATION OF SIR JOHN PERCYVALE IN MACCLELFIELD OF 1502, RE-FOUNDED BY KING EDWARD VI IN 1552 (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Higginson Chair 06 December 2019
None on record
Sarah Bryne Trustee 02 December 2022
None on record
Victoria Davidson Trustee 31 August 2022
None on record
Hamish Grant Trustee 04 December 2020
None on record
Louise Grainger Trustee 06 December 2019
None on record
Steve Murrells Trustee 06 December 2019
None on record
Dr Chris Doherty Trustee 06 December 2019
None on record
Jeremy Hinds Trustee 07 December 2018
None on record
JONATHAN PAUL WATKINS Trustee 11 March 2016
None on record
Dr NEIL HANLEY Trustee 11 March 2016
None on record
SIMON BARRISKELL Trustee 05 December 2014
None on record
IAN BRADLEY Trustee 30 June 2014
None on record
Michael John Strutt Trustee 12 March 2014
HERITAGE OPERA LIMITED
Received: On time
MACCLESFIELD MUSIC CENTRE
Received: On time
NATIONAL YOUTH CHOIRS OF GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
ST MICHAEL'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
CATHERINE HEAPY FOR THE MACCLESFIELD NATIONAL SCHOOL
Received: On time
CAROLINE CLULOW HALLET BEQUEST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS CHURCH, MACCLESFIELD
Received: On time
Juliette White Trustee 12 March 2014
EAST CHESHIRE HOSPICE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £13.27m £13.80m £15.05m £17.07m £17.23m
Total expenditure £12.18m £12.87m £14.55m £15.33m £16.79m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £43.00k £650.00k £322.00k £1.30m £120.00k
Income - Other trading activities £453.00k £0 £278.00k £502.00k £530.00k
Income - Charitable activities £12.56m £12.50m £14.23m £15.01m £16.08m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £45.00k £0 £0
Income - Investment £169.00k £63.00k £25.00k £42.00k £236.00k
Income - Other £49.00k £587.00k £190.00k £214.00k £256.00k
Income - Legacies £25.00k £13.00k £45.00k £1.27m £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.16m £12.87m £13.25m £14.56m £16.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.03m £0 £4.00k £4.00k £6.00k
Expenditure - Governance £62.00k £95.00k £60.00k £62.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £73.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £1.00k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.29m £763.00k £779.00k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Own use assets £691.00k £643.00k £63.52m £746.00k £60.77m
Long-term investments £33.93m £62.64m £758.00k £62.11m £710.00k
Other assets £18.34m £14.35m £10.04m £9.32m £7.47m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £10.52m £34.29m £28.08m £24.21m £20.58m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 24 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 24 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 24 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 24 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 18 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 18 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 17 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 20 December 2019 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 6 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOL BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, PRIZES OR OTHER SUITABLE REWARDS OR MARKS OF DISTINCTION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 01 December 2010 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Kings School
Alderley Road
Prestbury
MACCLESFIELD
Cheshire
SK10 4SP
Phone:
01625260010