Financial history WEST ITCHEN COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1130797
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £549.54k £477.49k £388.86k £326.49k £348.49k
Total expenditure £544.51k £472.99k £386.59k £401.22k £409.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £221.45k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £328.06k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £24 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £135.39k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £188.98k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £220.13k N/A N/A N/A N/A