VINE YOUTH MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating in Somerset anad Dorset, delivering modern and relevant collective worship to primary schools. The use of multimedia and live music engages the children and young people and provides an opportunity for them to hear a gospel message that is relevant to them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 07 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kate Konrad | Chair | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Daniel David Crouch | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Mark Henry Tizzard | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.35k | £22.50k | £23.98k | £22.97k | £17.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.13k | £16.82k | £25.92k | £23.66k | £25.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 July 2020 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 July 2020 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED 17 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF SCHOOLS IN SOMERSET AND DORSET BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES (NOT REQUIRED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOLS. THIS SERVICE SHALL BE PROVIDED FREE OF CHARGE TO ALL SCHOOLS IN THE AREA. 2 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN SOMERSET AND DORSET FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA. THIS SHALL BE DONE THROUGH SCHOOL ASSEMBLIES, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION CLASSES, LUNCH AND/OR AFTER SCHOOL CLUBS AND VISITS TO PRE-SCHOOLS. 3 TO ADVANCE MUSICAL EDUCATION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN SOMERSET AND DORSET. 4 TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 LIVING IN SOMERSET AND DORSET BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A REASON OF: A ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B ADVANCING EDUCATION; C PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
SOMERSET AND DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Poplar Drive
YEOVIL
Somerset
BA21 3UL
- Phone:
- 07879613446
- Email:
- revkatekonrad@gmail.com
- Website:
-
vym.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window