Financial history THE BRIDGE LANE BETH HAMEDRASH

Charity number: 1130334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £279.36k £222.59k £196.80k £216.30k £170.97k
Total expenditure £322.51k £229.84k £223.39k £211.32k £185.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A