WYCOMBE HOMELESS CONNECTION CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity number: 1131541
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Wycombe Homeless Connection provides a volunteer based night shelter in church halls during January - March with year round support, sign posting, advocacy, mentoring and drop-ins for single homeless people over 18. WHC works closely with the local authority homelessness department, probation service, health care, housing providers and employment sevices enabling guests to rebuild their lives.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2014

Total income: £158,034
Total expenditure: £144,900

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 September 2009: Standard registration
  • 03 June 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 03 June 2015: Funds transferred to 1156211 WYCOMBE HOMELESS CONNECTION
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WYCOMBE WINTER NIGHT SHELTER CHRISTIAN TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2010 30/04/2011 30/04/2012 30/04/2013 30/04/2014
Total gross income £72.35k £92.08k £112.52k £132.56k £158.03k
Total expenditure £73.67k £86.73k £97.11k £124.98k £144.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2014 09 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2014 29 January 2015 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2013 10 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2013 10 January 2014 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2012 11 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2012 11 January 2013 On Time