THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF TEDDINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL AND RAISE FUNDS TO SUPPORT AND IMPROVE FACILITIES AT THE HOSPITAL AND TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL OR PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF MEDICAL ATTENTION OR FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 21 July 2009: Standard registration
- 08 September 2011: Funds received from 283599 THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE TEDDINGTON MEMORIAL H...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Murray | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
John Warren | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sam Fudge | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Cecile Delattre | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Roberts | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Louise Robertson | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Edward James Brooker Marsh | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev CHARLES SIMON PELLEW DOUGLAS LANE | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.68k | £291.03k | £38.04k | £70.31k | £121.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £371.27k | £164.62k | £221.63k | £109.89k | £98.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/08/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE LEAGUE SHALL BE TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL, OR PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES, WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF MEDICAL ATTENTION OR FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TEDDINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
HAMPTON ROAD
TEDDINGTON
TW11 0JL
- Phone:
- 02087144074
- Email:
- treasurer@friends-tmh.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window