TARIRO - HOPE FOR YOUTH IN ZIMBABWE

Charity number: 1136035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance in life and relieve the needs of young people through the provision of financial support to help them develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals in Zimbabwe.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £189,339
Total expenditure: £201,710

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 May 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELIZABETH WILSON Chair 14 September 2009
None on record
Simon Robert Miller Trustee 18 March 2023
None on record
Rev George Paul Alfred Guiver Trustee 08 December 2018
THE SHEPHERDS LAW TRUST
Received: On time
THE COMMUNITY OF THE RESURRECTION
Received: On time
FRERE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
BIKO BOWCOTT CHARITABLE TRUST FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Thomas Brian Hatton Trustee 21 May 2017
ST AGNES DISCRETIONARY TRUST
Received: On time
JENNIFER STEBBING Trustee 01 August 2015
None on record
ADAM WILSON Trustee 14 November 2009
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET'S, ILKLEY
Received: On time
Rev MICHAEL LANGDALE STEBBING Fr Nicolas Trustee 14 November 2009
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £185.50k £205.80k £175.80k £242.99k £189.34k
Total expenditure £160.14k £191.60k £254.21k £266.40k £201.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 08 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 17 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 17 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 17 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 17 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 06 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 06 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 19 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HOUSE OF THE RESURRECTION
STOCKS BANK ROAD
MIRFIELD
WF14 0BN
Phone:
01924 494318