THE FRIENDS OF RICHMOND PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FRP aims to preserve the ecology of Richmond Park (RP) and its peace and tranquility. It promotes a "Tread Lightly" approach to RP through public education. FRP funds projects, and its volunteers: staff a Visitor Centre, do physical works, catalogue and publicise records and artefacts about RP, monitor large-scale events held in RP. FRP publishes guides and runs courses,walks and competitions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 09 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Brereton | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Allnutt | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Rosemary Pearson | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helene Feger | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Philip Sherwin | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Monique Marie Helene Sarkany | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Keith Hillyer | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr HUGH DEIGHTON | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Bostock | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr VIVIENNE ROSE PRESS | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|||||
NICK COLEMAN | Trustee | 24 April 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.40k | £120.67k | £70.05k | £73.93k | £66.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.96k | £64.08k | £95.80k | £88.95k | £52.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED 12 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL AND PHYSICAL ENVIRONMENT OF RICHMOND PARK (THE "PARK") AND ITS PEACE AND NATURAL BEAUTY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND FUTURE GENERATIONS, INCLUDING BY SEEKING TO LIMIT THE ADVERSE EFFECTS ON THE PARK OF POLICIES, DEVELOPMENTS AND ACTIVITIES WHICH MAY DAMAGE THE ATTRIBUTES OF THE PARK SET OUT IN (2) BELOW; AND (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC (I) IN RELATION TO THE PARK'S STATUS AS A NATIONAL NATURE RESERVE, A SITE OF SPECIAL SCIENTIFIC INTEREST, A SPECIAL AREA OF CONSERVATION AND A CONSERVATION AREA AND (II) GENERALLY IN RELATION TO THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PARK.
Area of benefit
RICHMOND PARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Ormonde Road
LONDON
SW14 7BE
- Phone:
- 02088782261
- Email:
- secretary@frp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window