Financial history FRIENDS OF ASHMOUNT SCHOOL

Charity number: 1132409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024 31/03/2025
Total gross income £9.92k £13.58k £14.69k £14.82k £17.14k
Total expenditure £10.65k £5.52k £16.06k £25.20k £17.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A