Financial history THE MAUREEN BEATRICE MCGARVEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1132886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/09/2020 28/09/2021 28/09/2022 28/09/2023 28/09/2024
Total gross income £5.01k £4.54k £6.34k £6.56k £24.02k
Total expenditure £12.09k £9.10k £9.80k £13.90k £20.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A