CARE FARM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Care Farming
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- Hertfordshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 10 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin hobson | Trustee |
|
||||||
Charles Arthur Haywood | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANDY SHARPE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 September 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROVIDE PEOPLE (ADULTS AND CHILDREN) WHO HAVE PROFOUND AND COMPLEX LEARNING, PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR OTHER FORMS OF DIFFICULTY, AS WELL AS THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, WITH HEALTH CARE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND TRAINING, ACCOMMODATION, RESPITE AND HOLIDAY FACILITIES AS WELL AS PROFESSIONAL ADVICE AND SUPPORT. (II) TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, SHELTER AND HOUSING AND ANY ANCILLARY FACILITIES, FOOD, CLOTHING, PHYSICAL, MENTAL, EDUCATIONAL AND SPIRITUAL CARE AND SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE WHO, THROUGH AGE, PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS, YOUTH, ALCOHOL, DRUG ADDICTION OR DEPENDENCY AND/OR POVERTY, ARE UNABLE TO MAKE ADEQUATE PROVISION FOR THEMSELVES. (III) TO PROVIDE AND ENCOURAGE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR MEDICAL REHABILITATION AND TREATMENT, SPIRITUAL HELP AND GUIDANCE, EDUCATION AND TRAINING. (IV) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING PROVIDING TRAINING AND ASSISTING TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
East Clayton Farm
Storrington Road
Washington
Pulborough
RH20 4AG
- Phone:
- 01903741011
- Email:
- ROBIN@LAURENCEGOULD.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window