Financial history GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1133244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £209.58k £374.35k £227.34k £287.31k £238.77k
Total expenditure £197.21k £236.03k £304.50k £286.39k £429.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A