SIERRA LEONE CANCER CHARITY (VIJI)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity brings the community together in pursuit of its goal to promote awareness of cancer prevalence in Sierra Leone. It supports projects that improve the welfare of cancer patients in Sierra Leone via training of clinical staff and healthworkers involved in cancer care, improving healthcare facilities and contributes to campaigns that raise awarness of cancer and promotes early diagnosis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 29 March 2010: Standard registration
- 25 October 2019: Funds received from 1014779 SIERRA LEONE ASSOCIATION NOTTINGHAMSHIRE BRANCH
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADEYEMI OLUSEGUN DARAMY | Chair |
|
||||||
FAYIE ISCANDARI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EVA FOLAKE RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RONITA SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGINA TAIWO AWOONOR-GORDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE JOHN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.32k | £2.17k | £3.51k | £1.72k | £1.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45k | £640 | £930 | £359 | £1.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 April 2022 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS, PRIMARILY IN SIERRA LEONE BY SUPPORTING ORGANISATIONS, MEDICAL PERSONNEL AND PROJECTS IN THE FIELD OF CANCER PREVENTION AND TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
SIERRA LEONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 GAUNTLETT ROAD
SUTTON
SM1 4RY
- Phone:
- 447863007220
- Email:
- info@slccviji.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window