PURLEY CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1134261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Purley Circuit co-ordinates and supports the activity of 5 Methodist Churches and 1 Local Ecumenical Partnership (with the United Reformed Church). These run over the southern part of the Borough of Croydon, include one church in the borough of Sutton (but only just so) and 2 churches in the Tandridge District of Surrey. Each of these churches devise their own programme of activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £183,074
Total expenditure: £442,107

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Croydon
  • Surrey
  • Sutton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 February 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

28 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev GRAHAM KEITH CLAYDON-KNIGHTS Chair 01 September 2023
None on record
Anne Josephine Downey Trustee 18 September 2024
None on record
Rev Jonathan Dean Trustee 01 September 2024
Westminster Methodist Central Hall Trust
Received: On time
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
CROYDON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
LONDON DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
EALING TRINITY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Jill Gradon Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dr Robert James Baston Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Curtis Mark Juman Trustee 11 March 2021
None on record
Rev Sang Wook Han Trustee 15 September 2020
None on record
Rev Ermal Boston Kirby Trustee 05 March 2020
None on record
Susan Jean Stevens Trustee 05 March 2020
None on record
Doreen Ann Wright Trustee 05 March 2020
None on record
Maureen Angella Cebreiro Trustee 05 March 2020
None on record
Enock Omonya Nyongesa Trustee 07 March 2019
None on record
Rev STEPHEN ROBERT MARES Trustee 18 September 2018
None on record
DAVID ROBERT POORE Trustee 10 September 2015
None on record
PETER GEOFFREY GAMMIE Trustee 04 September 2014
None on record
ANN VERA WAGSTAFF Trustee 21 March 2013
None on record
MRS H JUMAN Trustee 11 February 2012
WARLINGHAM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
EDDIE TAYLOR Trustee 11 February 2012
None on record
ELAINE SANDRA BURROWS Trustee 02 September 2011
None on record
MRS M ISTED-OSBORN Trustee 02 September 2011
None on record
MRS T E WALLBANK Trustee
None on record
ELEANOR ELIZABETH DAY Trustee
None on record
CHRISTINA MARY DENCH Trustee
None on record
HELEN RANKIN Trustee
None on record
JEANNE REVNELL Trustee
None on record
DORIS EDITH NICHOLLS Trustee
None on record
MR A B WALLBANK Trustee
None on record
PAMELA JUNE OSBORNE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £174.04k £174.61k £158.53k £132.93k £183.07k
Total expenditure £150.61k £178.78k £185.79k £421.66k £442.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 10 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Sanderstead Methodist Church
Limpsfield Road
South Croydon
CR2 9EF
Phone:
02086577947