NEWHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Coordinate the activities of 7 local Methodist Churches. This includes worship and community outreach to improve the quality of life in Newham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

37 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Newham
Governance
- 08 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Asif Karam | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ntow | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Charity Madenyika | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
AMY FISHER | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID AGYEMAN-MENSAH | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ayo Hanson | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emiola Ogunrinade | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
SORIE IBRAHIM MOHAMED KAMARA | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Folashade Omoniwa | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ISAAC ANKOMAH | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|||||
OLAYINKA AINA | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDEN GAROY | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CALVERT ANDOH | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev ELIZABETH OWUSU OSEI | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
GRACE FALOLU-JAMES | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Danso | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Greaves | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ERIC WALKER | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Marion Gaima | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Atto Saah | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
GWENETTE EARLE WATSON | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
FLORENCE OGUNBISI | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
KAYODE OLUKOYA | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL NANTWI | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JONES AGYEMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|||||
RICHARD WILLIAM COCKLEY | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
VITELLA ABIMBOLA THOMPSON | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROSETTA PARKINS | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
SAM AGYEMAN-MENSAH | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|||||
REV SARA EDITH COGGIN BA HONS | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
HANDINETI MUTETE | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL REGAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOAN SAMUEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPH RALPH SASU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIOLET MAY WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DELROY MCDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWEN HENRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £247.35k | £252.22k | £290.72k | £217.86k | £309.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.34k | £196.31k | £244.36k | £181.50k | £227.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 July 2024 | 391 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 July 2024 | 391 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2023 | 355 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2023 | 355 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 April 2021 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 April 2021 | 302 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANOR PARK METHODIST CHURCH
HERBERT ROAD
LONDON
E12 6AY
- Phone:
- 02088575615
- Email:
- asif.karam@methodist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window