Financial history CYFEILLION SWTAN

Charity number: 1138229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £74 £3.51k £22.31k £10.90k £8.04k
Total expenditure £1.76k £2.43k £18.01k £9.96k £11.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A