CAMBRIDGE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Circuit's policy is framed in the light of the Methodist Church's calling. Through the structures of the Circuit local churches assist each other to respond to their calling seeking to deploy shared resources effectively to that end.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

31 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 February 2010: Standard registration
- 25 October 2019: Funds received from 1166110 CASTLE END MISSION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
31 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rose Audrey Sandford Westwood | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Noelle Poulter | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Philip Robert Howie | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Mackintosh | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|||||
John Edwin Wyborn | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM BURGHALL | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Gill Grainger | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jennifer Pathmarajah | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Christopher Boocock | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Janet Blair | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Carter | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Nick Keep | Trustee | 26 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Miss K Coles | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev Charity Nzegwu | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Deacon Ian Henry Murray | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|||||
WENDY ANNE TIMBS | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
GORDON CHARLES HEALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELSIE ELLEN SALMON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDY WYNN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA MARY TEBBIT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCES ANNE PASCOE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ASHLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
GEOFFREY BATTY MA | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROSEMARY ANN WATSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN RAYSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIKE SHARPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVE ACKLAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGUS CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE GOODALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHYLLIS JOYCE SALMON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSS ALEXANDER MCEWAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £281.63k | £234.74k | £272.17k | £297.78k | £279.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £326.76k | £299.01k | £318.33k | £320.61k | £355.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAMBRIDGE METHODIST CIRCUIT
CIRCUIT OFFICE
WESLEY METHODIST CHURCH
CHRISTS PIECES
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 1LG
- Phone:
- 01223 352115
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window